Wisconsin – Marinette – Pound
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Wisconsin
Marinette
Pound
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
13061
1915
FDIC Certificate Number: 13061
FDIC's unique number: 8257
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Appleton
Federal Reserve ID Number: 145246
Report Date: 1993-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1993-07-21
1915-07-15 Institution established. Original name: Farmers State Bank.
1991-12-01 Reorganized.
1993-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Associated Bank Green Bay, National Association in Green Bay, Wisconsin.
1998-11-12 Reorganized.
1999-06-18 Acquired Citizens Bank, National Association in Shawano, Wisconsin.
2001-04-20 Changed name to Associated Bank, National Association .
2001-04-20 Acquired Associated Bank Milwaukee in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2001-04-20 Acquired Associated Bank, National Association in Neenah, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank Lakeshore, National Association in Manitowoc, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank North in Wausau, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank South Central in Madison, Wisconsin.
2003-09-12 Acquired Associated Card Services Bank, National Association in Stevens Point, Wisconsin.
2003-11-21 Acquired Associated Bank Illinois, National Association in Rockford, Illinois.
2005-02-19 Acquired First Federal Capital Bank in La Crosse, Wisconsin.
2005-07-15 Acquired Associated Bank Minnesota, National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2005-07-15 Acquired Associated Bank Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2005-10-21 Reorganized.
2005-11-04 Acquired State Financial Bank, National Association in Hales Corners, Wisconsin.
2007-06-29 Acquired The First National Bank Of Hudson in Woodbury, Minnesota.
Total assets: $72,450,000
Total deposits: $65,402,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17389