Minnesota – Faribault – Huntley
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Minnesota
Faribault
Huntley
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
1920
1916
FDIC Certificate Number: 1920
FDIC's unique number: 1285
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Mankato
Federal Reserve ID Number: 906755
Report Date: 1998-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1998-08-04
1916-04-16 Institution established. Original name: Farmers State Bank Of Huntley, Incorporated.
1998-07-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Alliance Bank in New Ulm, Minnesota.
2000-10-28 Acquired Courtland State Bank in Courtland, Minnesota.
2007-02-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Alliance Bank in Lake City, Minnesota.
Total assets: $11,027,000
Total deposits: $9,149,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers State Bank of Huntley, Incorporated does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers State Bank of Huntley, Incorporated, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers State Bank of Huntley, Incorporated will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5714