Colorado
Yuma
Yuma
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
10417
1911
FDIC Certificate Number: 10417
FDIC's unique number: 6660
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 358055
Report Date: 1989-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1911-08-11 Institution established. Original name: Farmers State Bank Of Yuma.
1989-08-24 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Colorado in Fort Collins, Colorado.
1998-06-29 Changed name to Bank Of Colorado .
1998-12-19 Acquired Bank Of Colorado-front Range in Windsor, Colorado.
2000-01-21 Acquired The Burns National Bank Of Durango in Durango, Colorado.
2001-09-19 Moved bank headquarters from Fort Lupton, Colorado to Fort Collins, Colorado.
2004-07-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Colorado Springs in Colorado Springs, Colorado.
2004-09-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2004-09-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2005-03-12 Acquired Western Bank in Gallup, New Mexico.
Total assets: $26,604,000
Total deposits: $24,864,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers State Bank of Yuma does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers State Bank of Yuma, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers State Bank of Yuma will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1563