Iowa – Winnebago – Buffalo Center
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.ftsbbank.com
Iowa
Winnebago
Buffalo Center
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
14195
1914
FDIC Certificate Number: 14195
FDIC's unique number: 8862
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Des Moines
Federal Reserve ID Number: 825847
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1914-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Farmers Trust And Savings Bank.
1978-01-24 Changed name to Farmers Trust And Savings Bank .
Total assets: $173,315,000
Total deposits: $131,411,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $131,411,000
Equity capital: $16,038,000
Net income: $1,166,000
Return on Assets: 1.36
Return on Equity: 14.73
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Koss-Winn Bancshares, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan With 401(K) Provisions
Farmers Trust And Savings Bank - Britt Branch
Farmers Trust And Savings Bank - Farmers Trust And Savings Bank
Farmers Trust And Savings Bank - Lake Mills Branch
Farmers Trust And Savings Bank - Lakota Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers Trust and Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers Trust and Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers Trust and Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3899