Iowa – Shelby – Earling
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.ftnsbank.net
Iowa
Shelby
Earling
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
8510
1892
FDIC Certificate Number: 8510
FDIC's unique number: 5420
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Omaha
Federal Reserve ID Number: 646042
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-06-03
1892-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Farmers Trust & Savings Bank.
1918-09-19 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
Total assets: $82,404,000
Total deposits: $68,380,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $68,380,000
Equity capital: $7,907,000
Net income: $607,000
Return on Assets: 1.51
Return on Equity: 15.58
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: J. Carl H. Bancorporation
Farmers Trust & Savings Bank - Farmers Trust & Savings Bank
Farmers Trust & Savings Bank - Harlan Branch
Farmers Trust & Savings Bank - Woodbine Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers Trust & Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers Trust & Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers Trust & Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24618