Delaware – New Castle – Wilmington
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.bankofamerica.com
Delaware
New Castle
Wilmington
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
33318
1991
FDIC Certificate Number: 33318
FDIC's unique number: 46868
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1830035
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 22381
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 1
The date of the last data update: 2009-11-24
1991-01-29 Institution established. Original name: Mbna America, National Association.
1991-01-30 Changed name to Mbna America Bank, National Association .
1996-01-05 Changed organization type to Credit Card Bank.
1996-06-01 Moved bank headquarters from Newark, Delaware to Wilmington, Delaware.
1999-03-29 Acquired Pnc National Bank in Wilmington, Delaware.
2006-06-10 Changed name to Fia Card Services, National Association .
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank Of America, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
Total assets: $187,296,365,000
Total deposits: $95,245,158,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $91,582,819,000
Equity capital: $28,692,910,000
Net income: $3,485,229,000
Return on Assets: 3.65
Return on Equity: 25.91
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Bank Of America Corporation
Fia Card Services, National Association - Fia Card Services, Nat
Fia Card Services, National Association - Mbna American Bank Cay
No associations
LandOfFree
FIA Card Services, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with FIA Card Services, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and FIA Card Services, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20312