Texas – Collin – Plano
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Texas
Collin
Plano
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
35266
1999
FDIC Certificate Number: 35266
FDIC's unique number: 77230
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2841702
Report Date: 2010-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2011-03-30
1999-12-15 Institution established. Original name: Parkway Bank, National Association.
2006-06-23 Changed name to Fidelity Bank, National Association .
2008-09-29 Changed name to Fidelity Bank .
2008-09-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2008-09-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2011-03-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Veritex Community Bank, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
Total assets: $144,740,000
Total deposits: $122,924,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Fidelity Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Fidelity Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Fidelity Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17582