Delaware – New Castle – New Castle
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Delaware
New Castle
New Castle
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
27109
1987
FDIC Certificate Number: 27109
FDIC's unique number: 38794
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1160536
Report Date: 1991-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1991-07-24
1987-12-01 Institution established. Original name: Fidelity Bank Delaware.
1991-06-11 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.
Total assets: $143,435,000
Total deposits: $554,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Fidelity Bank Delaware does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Fidelity Bank Delaware, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Fidelity Bank Delaware will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19387