Indiana – Ripley – Batesville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Indiana
Ripley
Batesville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
4314
1905
FDIC Certificate Number: 4314
FDIC's unique number: 2830
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 626044
Report Date: 1988-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1905-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Bank & Trust Company Of Batesville.
1978-01-01 Acquired The State Bank Of Milan in Milan, Indiana.
1988-02-01 Changed name to Fifth Third Bank Of Southeastern Indiana .
1989-01-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Fifth Third Bank of Southeastern Indiana in Greensburg, Indiana.
1990-09-10 Acquired Fifth Third Bank Of Eastern Indiana in Connersville, Indiana.
1995-04-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Fifth Third Bank of Central Indiana in Indianapolis, Indiana.
1998-11-03 Changed name to Fifth Third Bank, Indiana .
1999-11-20 Acquired Peoples Bank & Trust Company in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2000-03-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank, Indiana in Saint Joseph, Michigan.
2000-12-09 Acquired Ameribank in Holland, Michigan.
2001-05-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank, Indiana in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2001-12-29 Acquired Fifth Third Bank, Southwest, F.S.B. in Scottsdale, Arizona.
2003-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
2005-01-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Florida in Naples, Florida.
2005-02-28 Acquired First National Wealth Management Company in Naples, Florida.
2008-10-31 Acquired Freedom Bank in Bradenton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank in Cincinnati, Ohio.
Total assets: $96,902,000
Total deposits: $83,011,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Fifth Third Bank of Southeastern Indiana does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Fifth Third Bank of Southeastern Indiana, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Fifth Third Bank of Southeastern Indiana will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23432