California – Tulare – Porterville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.financeandthrift.com
California
Tulare
Porterville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
25870
1925
FDIC Certificate Number: 25870
FDIC's unique number: 32111
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sacramento
Federal Reserve ID Number: 803461
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 10
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-02-16
1925-07-09 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Peoples Finance & Thrift Company Of Porterville.
1984-12-17 Became FDIC insured.
Total assets: $124,723,000
Total deposits: $96,111,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $96,111,000
Equity capital: $26,805,000
Net income: $579,000
Return on Assets: 0.95
Return on Equity: 4.37
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Finance And Thrift Company - Arvin Branch
Finance And Thrift Company - Bakersfield Branch
Finance And Thrift Company - Delano Branch
Finance And Thrift Company - Finance And Thrift Company
Finance And Thrift Company - Fresno Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Finance and Thrift Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Finance and Thrift Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Finance and Thrift Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20223