New Hampshire – Hillsborough – Manchester
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Hillsborough
Manchester
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
34264
1997
FDIC Certificate Number: 34264
FDIC's unique number: 57023
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2565660
Report Date: 2000-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2001-02-06
1997-04-07 Institution established. Original name: First Alliance Bank And Trust Company.
1997-11-24 Moved bank headquarters from Portsmouth, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
2001-02-02 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Southern New Hampshire Bank and Trust Company in Salem, New Hampshire.
2001-02-02 FDIC closing information for
First Alliance Bank And Trust Company : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/firstalliance.html.
2007-04-02 Changed name to Bank Of New England .
Total assets: $17,438,000
Total deposits: $16,931,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Alliance Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Alliance Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Alliance Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7862