Texas – Hopkins – Sulphur Springs
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Hopkins
Sulphur Springs
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
19014
1964
FDIC Certificate Number: 19014
FDIC's unique number: 12855
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 463061
Report Date: 1999-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15250
The date of the last data update: 1999-09-23
1964-01-24 Institution established. Original name: Peoples National Bank Of Sulphur Springs.
1983-06-01 Changed name to Banctexas Sulphur Springs National Association .
1987-07-17 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
1988-04-29 Changed name to First American Bank Sulphur Springs National Association .
1991-06-14 Acquired Texas Commercial Federal Savings Association in Sulphur Springs, Texas.
1993-03-17 Changed name to First American Bank And Mortgage, National Association .
1998-08-20 Changed name to First American Bank, National Association .
1999-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Guaranty Bank in Mount Pleasant, Texas.
2002-08-30 Changed name to Guaranty Bond Bank .
2008-12-12 Reorganized.
Total assets: $61,640,000
Total deposits: $56,962,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First American Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First American Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First American Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5110