Oklahoma – Woodward – Woodward
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Oklahoma
Woodward
Woodward
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
22962
1979
FDIC Certificate Number: 22962
FDIC's unique number: 16065
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 58159
Report Date: 2000-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16807
The date of the last data update: 2000-11-17
1979-09-29 Institution established. Original name: American National Bank.
1995-07-01 Changed name to First American Bank, National Association .
2000-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First American Bank and Trust Company in Purcell, Oklahoma.
2000-11-30 Changed name to First American Bank .
Total assets: $38,843,000
Total deposits: $35,893,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First American Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First American Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First American Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11238