Virginia – Shenandoah – Strasburg
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.therespowericom
Virginia
Shenandoah
Strasburg
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
6917
1907
FDIC Certificate Number: 6917
FDIC's unique number: 4648
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Richmond
Federal Reserve ID Number: 899428
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 10
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-01-06
1907-07-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Strasburg.
1994-06-01 Changed name to First Bank .
1994-06-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
Total assets: $554,519,000
Total deposits: $476,627,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $476,627,000
Equity capital: $57,157,000
Net income: $249,000
Return on Assets: 0.09
Return on Equity: 0.87
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: First National Corporation
First Bank - First Bank
First Bank - Front Royal Express Office Branch
First Bank - Front Royal Financial Center Branch
First Bank - Kernstown Branch
First Bank - Mt Jackson Financial Center Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13340