Delaware – New Castle – Wilmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.fbdel.com
Delaware
New Castle
Wilmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
34929
1999
FDIC Certificate Number: 34929
FDIC's unique number: 62048
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2791281
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1999-06-01 Institution established. Original name: Republic First Bank Of Delaware.
2001-02-22 Changed name to First Bank Of Delaware .
2001-02-22 Moved bank headquarters from Brandywine, Delaware to Wilmington, Delaware.
2003-09-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2003-09-30 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
Total assets: $212,210,000
Total deposits: $160,248,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $160,248,000
Equity capital: $47,507,000
Net income: $3,066,000
Return on Assets: 2.78
Return on Equity: 13.29
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
First Bank Of Delaware - First Bank Of Delaware
First Bank Of Delaware - Limestone Road Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First Bank of Delaware does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Bank of Delaware, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Bank of Delaware will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8019