Missouri – Clay – Kansas City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.firstbankmo.com
Missouri
Clay
Kansas City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
18815
1963
FDIC Certificate Number: 18815
FDIC's unique number: 12675
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 954457
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 10
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-08-12
1963-07-02 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Gladstone.
1986-09-05 Changed name to First Bank Of Gladstone .
1993-11-30 Acquired Citizens Bank And Trust Company in Smithville, Missouri.
1993-11-30 Changed name to First Bank Of Missouri .
1993-11-30 Acquired The Bank Of St. Joseph in St. Joseph, Missouri.
Total assets: $505,098,000
Total deposits: $400,430,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $400,430,000
Equity capital: $64,217,000
Net income: $2,565,000
Return on Assets: 1.02
Return on Equity: 8.2
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Valley View Bancshares, Inc.
First Bank Of Missouri - Big V Branch
First Bank Of Missouri - Cherokee Facility
First Bank Of Missouri - East Drive-In Branch
First Bank Of Missouri - Faraon Branch
First Bank Of Missouri - First Bank Of Missouri
No associations
LandOfFree
First Bank of Missouri does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Bank of Missouri, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Bank of Missouri will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1148