South Dakota – Brookings – Brookings
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.bankeasy.com/brookings
South Dakota
Brookings
Brookings
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
3973
1925
FDIC Certificate Number: 3973
FDIC's unique number: 2584
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 77851
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-02-05
1925-11-02 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank In Brookings.
1993-01-31 Acquired Home Trust Savings And Loan Association in Vermillion, South Dakota.
2004-12-01 Changed name to First Bank & Trust .
2004-12-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2004-12-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
Total assets: $812,078,000
Total deposits: $691,575,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $691,575,000
Equity capital: $83,732,000
Net income: $5,533,000
Return on Assets: 1.36
Return on Equity: 13.54
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Fishback Financial Corporation
First Bank & Trust - Brookings Mall Branch
First Bank & Trust - First Bank & Trust
First Bank & Trust - Garretson Branch
First Bank & Trust - Sixth Street Branch
First Bank & Trust - Vermillion Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First Bank & Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Bank & Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Bank & Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8278