Texas – Hardeman – Quanah
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.fnbq.com
Texas
Hardeman
Quanah
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
3399
1907
FDIC Certificate Number: 3399
FDIC's unique number: 2213
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lubbock
Federal Reserve ID Number: 919568
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-06-09
1907-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank In Quanah.
2011-05-19 Changed name to First Capital Bank .
2011-05-19 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2011-05-19 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
Total assets: $57,871,000
Total deposits: $53,366,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $53,366,000
Equity capital: $4,430,000
Net income: $115,000
Return on Assets: 0.41
Return on Equity: 5.19
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Quanah Financial Corporation Employee Stock Ownership Plan
First Capital Bank - First Capital Bank
First Capital Bank - Wichita National Bank Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First Capital Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Capital Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Capital Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11700