New Hampshire
Belknap
Laconia
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
18029
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 18029
FDIC's unique number: 11958
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 588900
Report Date: 1990-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1991-02-11
1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Plymouth Guaranty Savings Bank.
1982-01-01 Acquired Granite State Trust Company in Lincoln, New Hampshire.
1987-01-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1988-07-01 Acquired Laconia Peoples National Bank And Trust Company in Laconia, New Hampshire.
1988-07-01 Changed name to First Central Bank .
1988-07-01 Acquired Meredith Bank & Trust in Meredith, New Hampshire.
1988-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Plymouth, New Hampshire to Laconia, New Hampshire.
1990-01-05 Acquired Wolfeboro National Bank in Wolfeboro, New Hampshire.
1991-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1991-03-29 Acquired City Bank And Trust in Claremont, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Nashua Trust Company in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Amoskeag Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bank Meridian, National Association in Hampton, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $440,062,000
Total deposits: $371,063,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Central Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Central Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Central Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2521