New Hampshire – Cheshire – Keene
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Cheshire
Keene
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
6228
1804
FDIC Certificate Number: 6228
FDIC's unique number: 4200
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 558305
Report Date: 1989-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1804-10-10 Institution established. Original name: The Cheshire National Bank Of Keene.
1974-11-01 Changed name to The Cheshire National Bank .
1987-01-01 Reorganized.
1987-01-01 Changed name to First Cheshire Bank .
1990-02-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $94,501,000
Total deposits: $88,656,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Cheshire Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Cheshire Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Cheshire Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3626