New Hampshire – Sullivan – Newport
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
New Hampshire
Sullivan
Newport
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6243
1853
FDIC Certificate Number: 6243
FDIC's unique number: 4212
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 582609
Report Date: 1985-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 888
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-11
1853-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Citizens National Bank.
1975-08-01 Acquired The Citizen's National Bank Of Newport in Newport, New Hampshire.
1985-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BankEast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1987-11-01 Acquired Hanover Bank & Trust Company in Hanover, New Hampshire.
1989-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BankEast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank New Hampshire in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $28,170,000
Total deposits: $25,426,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Citizens National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Citizens National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Citizens National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10787