Texas – Collin – Plano
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Collin
Plano
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
23526
1981
FDIC Certificate Number: 23526
FDIC's unique number: 16478
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 846664
Report Date: 1988-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17072
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1981-08-14 Institution established. Original name: Chisholm National Bank.
1983-01-02 Changed name to First City Bank Of Plano, National Association .
1988-04-20 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
1988-12-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First City Bank of Dallas in Dallas, Texas.
1989-03-31 Changed name to First City, Texas - Dallas .
1992-10-30 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of New First City, Texas - Dallas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1993-02-13 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Texas Commerce Bank, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1993-12-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Texas Commerce Bank National Association in Houston, Texas.
1993-12-17 Acquired Texas Commerce Trust Company, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1994-04-14 Acquired Cullen/frost Bank Of Dallas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1998-01-20 Changed name to Chase Bank Of Texas, National Association .
2000-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Chase Manhattan Bank in New York City, New York.
2001-08-01 Acquired Chase Bank Of Texas-san Angelo, National Association in San Angelo, Texas.
2001-11-10 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank .
2001-11-10 Acquired Morgan Guaranty Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2004-11-13 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association .
2004-11-13 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2004-11-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2004-11-13 Moved bank headquarters from New York City, New York to Columbus, Ohio.
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $62,461,000
Total deposits: $58,488,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First City Bank of Plano, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First City Bank of Plano, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First City Bank of Plano, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20471