Texas – Young – Graham
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Young
Graham
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
3227
1901
FDIC Certificate Number: 3227
FDIC's unique number: 2082
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 450351
Report Date: 1992-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 5897
The date of the last data update: 1992-11-04
1901-06-01 Institution established. Original name: The Graham National Bank.
1988-08-04 Changed name to First City, Texas National Association .
1989-03-31 Changed name to First City, Texas - Graham, National Association .
1992-10-30 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of New First City, Texas - Graham, National Association in Graham, Texas.
1993-02-13 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank of Olney in Olney, Texas.
2010-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of InterBank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2011-06-14 Acquired First National Bank Of Borger in Panhandle, Texas.
Total assets: $95,398,000
Total deposits: $86,486,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First City, Texas - Graham, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First City, Texas - Graham, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First City, Texas - Graham, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22771