Texas – Guadalupe – Seguin
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.1cb.com
Texas
Guadalupe
Seguin
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
24603
1983
FDIC Certificate Number: 24603
FDIC's unique number: 17087
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin
Federal Reserve ID Number: 400365
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17862
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1983-07-01 Institution established. Original name: First Commercial Bank, National Association.
1989-03-09 Acquired Lakeway National Bank in Austin, Texas.
1995-04-04 Reorganized.
Total assets: $115,441,000
Total deposits: $104,772,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $104,772,000
Equity capital: $10,354,000
Net income: $456,000
Return on Assets: 0.81
Return on Equity: 8.99
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: First Commercial Financial Corp
First Commercial Bank, National Association - First Commercial B
First Commercial Bank, National Association - New Braunfels Bran
First Commercial Bank, National Association - New Bruanfels Bran
No associations
LandOfFree
First Commercial Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Commercial Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Commercial Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26121