Missouri – Taney – Branson
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.fcboz.com
Missouri
Taney
Branson
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
33832
1993
FDIC Certificate Number: 33832
FDIC's unique number: 48139
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2107341
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1993-10-01 Institution established. Original name: First Community Bank Of Taney County.
2000-03-20 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
2001-03-20 Changed trust powers from Limited Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
2004-12-03 Changed name to First Community Bank Of The Ozarks .
Total assets: $98,444,000
Total deposits: $83,215,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $83,215,000
Equity capital: $4,318,000
Net income: $-1,940,000
Return on Assets: -3.81
Return on Equity: -71.55
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: M & L Holding Company
First Community Bank Of The Ozarks - First Community Bank Of The
First Community Bank Of The Ozarks - First Community Bank Of The
First Community Bank Of The Ozarks - First Community Bank Of The
First Community Bank Of The Ozarks - Forsyth Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First Community Bank of the Ozarks does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Community Bank of the Ozarks, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Community Bank of the Ozarks will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9762