New Hampshire
Rockingham
Windham
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
26714
1986
FDIC Certificate Number: 26714
FDIC's unique number: 35791
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 217602
Report Date: 1993-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1994-01-24
1986-07-07 Institution established. Original name: Fortune Guaranty Savings Bank.
1989-06-30 Reorganized.
1989-09-15 Changed name to First Essex Savings Bank Of New Hampshire .
1993-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Essex Bank, FSB in Lawrence, Massachusetts.
1996-12-30 Acquired Pelham Bank And Trust Company in Pelham, New Hampshire.
2001-03-31 Changed name to First Essex Bank .
2001-03-31 Changed institution class to Fdic Supervised Savings Bank.
2001-03-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2004-02-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sovereign Bank in Wyomissing, Pennsylvania.
2004-07-23 Acquired Nantucket Bank in Nantucket, Massachusetts.
2004-07-23 Acquired Compass Bank For Savings in New Bedford, Massachusetts.
2005-02-11 Acquired Waypoint Bank in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania.
2006-09-09 Acquired Independence Community Bank in Brooklyn, New York.
2011-06-20 Moved bank headquarters from Wyomissing, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $37,487,000
Total deposits: $25,049,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Essex Savings Bank of New Hampshire does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Essex Savings Bank of New Hampshire, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Essex Savings Bank of New Hampshire will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5172