Indiana – Sullivan – Sullivan
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.first-online.com
Indiana
Sullivan
Sullivan
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
17456
1955
FDIC Certificate Number: 17456
FDIC's unique number: 11445
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 760041
Report Date: 2004-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2004-10-18
1955-08-13 Institution established. Original name: Farmers State Bank Of Sullivan.
1987-12-29 Changed name to First Farmers State Bank .
1991-09-24 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1991-11-14 Acquired Worthington State Bank in Worthington, Indiana.
2004-09-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Financial Bank, National Association in Terre Haute, Indiana.
2005-02-13 Acquired First Crawford State Bank in Robinson, Illinois.
2005-09-10 Acquired First Community Bank, National Association in Olney, Illinois.
2009-07-02 Acquired The First National Bank Of Danville in Danville, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $183,071,000
Total deposits: $123,948,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Farmers State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Farmers State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Farmers State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8082