Colorado – Moffat – Craig
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Colorado
Moffat
Craig
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
29265
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 29265
FDIC's unique number: 42099
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 917274
Report Date: 1987-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-01-01
1934-12-01 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1988-03-31 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Great West Savings Bank, FSB in Craig, Colorado.
1989-05-31 Changed name to Great West Savings Bank, F.S.B. .
1990-05-11 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Great West Federal Savings Bank in Craig, Colorado.
1991-08-16 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Meeker in Meeker, Colorado.
1992-02-01 Changed name to First National Bank Of The Rockies .
1997-05-02 Acquired Rocky Mountain State Bank in Rangely, Colorado.
1997-05-02 Acquired Rio Blanco State Bank in Rangely, Colorado.
1999-07-01 Acquired Yampa Valley National Bank in Hayden, Colorado.
2004-01-02 Moved bank headquarters from Meeker, Colorado to Grand Junction, Colorado.
2004-01-02 Reorganized.
Total assets: $30,101,000
Total deposits: $33,042,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13852