Indiana – Noble – Kendallville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Indiana
Noble
Kendallville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
28510
1885
FDIC Certificate Number: 28510
FDIC's unique number: 41344
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 309673
Report Date: 1990-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1991-08-02
1885-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Kendallville.
1990-08-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Peoples Federal Savings Bank of DeKalb County in Auburn, Indiana.
2007-10-01 Acquired First Savings Bank, A Fsb in Three Rivers, Michigan.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $28,610,000
Total deposits: $27,426,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Kendallville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Kendallville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Kendallville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19030