Illinois – Ogle – Rochelle
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Illinois
Ogle
Rochelle
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
31734
1974
FDIC Certificate Number: 31734
FDIC's unique number: 44568
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Princeton
Federal Reserve ID Number: 576877
Report Date: 1981-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-17
1974-11-04 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Rochelle.
1981-11-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Rockford in Rockford, Illinois.
1991-02-11 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1992-10-02 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1992-10-02 Changed name to First Federal Savings Bank, F.S.B. .
1995-02-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Financial Bank, FSB in Stevens Point, Wisconsin.
1996-01-01 Changed name to First Financial Bank .
1998-11-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Associated Bank Milwaukee in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2001-04-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Associated Bank, National Association in Green Bay, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank Lakeshore, National Association in Manitowoc, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank North in Wausau, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank South Central in Madison, Wisconsin.
2003-09-12 Acquired Associated Card Services Bank, National Association in Stevens Point, Wisconsin.
2003-11-21 Acquired Associated Bank Illinois, National Association in Rockford, Illinois.
2005-02-19 Acquired First Federal Capital Bank in La Crosse, Wisconsin.
2005-07-15 Acquired Associated Bank Minnesota, National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2005-07-15 Acquired Associated Bank Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2005-10-21 Reorganized.
2005-11-04 Acquired State Financial Bank, National Association in Hales Corners, Wisconsin.
2007-06-29 Acquired The First National Bank Of Hudson in Woodbury, Minnesota.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Rochelle does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Rochelle, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Rochelle will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25132