Iowa – Black Hawk – Waterloo
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Iowa
Black Hawk
Waterloo
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
28766
1878
FDIC Certificate Number: 28766
FDIC's unique number: 41600
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Cedar Rapids
Federal Reserve ID Number: 510572
Report Date: 1987-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-01-01
1878-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings Bank.
1984-03-31 Acquired Oelwein Federal Savings And Loan Association in Oelwein, Iowa.
1988-03-31 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Statesman Bank for Savings, FSB in Waterloo, Iowa.
1990-07-27 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Statesman Federal Savings Bank in Des Moines, Iowa.
1991-03-01 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of West Des Moines State Bank in West Des Moines, Iowa.
1994-06-24 Acquired United Federal Savings Association Of Iowa in Des Moines, Iowa as part of a government assisted transaction.
2003-07-19 Acquired Hawkeye State Bank in Iowa City, Iowa.
2003-11-19 Changed name to West Bank .
Total assets: $152,339,000
Total deposits: $173,986,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25713