Georgia – Troup – Lagrange
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Troup
Lagrange
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
29927
1927
FDIC Certificate Number: 29927
FDIC's unique number: 42761
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 861078
Report Date: 2000-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2001-01-16
1927-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1987-04-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1989-06-30 Changed name to First Federal Savings Bank Of La Grange .
1998-10-20 Changed name to First Flag Bank .
1999-06-11 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1999-06-11 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2000-02-11 Acquired The Citizens Bank in Hogansville, Georgia.
2000-12-30 Acquired Thomaston Federal Savings Bank in Thomaston, Georgia.
2000-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of FLAG Bank in Vienna, Georgia.
2002-12-30 Moved bank headquarters from La Grange, Georgia to Atlanta, Georgia.
2005-12-02 Acquired First Capital Bank in Norcross, Georgia.
2006-12-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBC Centura Bank in Raleigh, North Carolina.
2008-04-05 Changed name to Rbc Bank .
2008-04-12 Acquired Indian River National Bank in Vero Beach, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Georgia State Bank in Mableton, Georgia.
2008-04-12 Acquired The Peachtree Bank in Duluth, Georgia.
2008-04-12 Acquired Millennium Bank in Gainesville, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Florida Choice Bank in Mount Dora, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Community Bank Of Naples, National Association in Naples, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Cypress Coquina Bank in Ormond Beach, Florida.
2008-06-21 Acquired Alabama Exchange Bank in Tuskegee, Alabama.
2008-06-21 Acquired First American Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
Total assets: $223,448,000
Total deposits: $183,288,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Flag Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Flag Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Flag Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8949