Pennsylvania – Luzerne – Wilkes Barre
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
www.firstheritagebank.com
Pennsylvania
Luzerne
Wilkes Barre
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
33913
1994
FDIC Certificate Number: 33913
FDIC's unique number: 54769
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2214744
Report Date: 2004-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2004-05-28
1994-06-22 Institution established. Original name: First Heritage Bank.
2004-05-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community Bank, National Association in Canton, New York.
2006-08-11 Acquired Elmira Savings And Loan FA in Elmira, New York.
2006-12-01 Acquired Ontario National Bank in Clifton Springs, New York.
2007-06-01 Acquired The Tupper Lake National Bank in Tupper Lake, New York.
2011-04-09 Acquired Wilber National Bank in Oneonta, New York.
Total assets: $269,730,000
Total deposits: $204,699,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Heritage Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Heritage Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Heritage Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5104