New Jersey – Salem – Pennsville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
New Jersey
Salem
Pennsville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
31771
1911
FDIC Certificate Number: 31771
FDIC's unique number: 44605
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 567576
Report Date: 1998-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-10-08
1911-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Kosciuszko Savings And Loan Association.
1987-04-30 Changed name to Kosicuszko Federal Savings Bank .
1987-04-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1993-06-26 Acquired First Home Savings Bank, Sla in Penns Grove, New Jersey.
1993-06-26 Changed name to First Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. .
1993-06-26 Moved bank headquarters from Wilmington, Delaware to Pennsville, New Jersey.
1998-07-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sovereign Bank in Wyomissing, Pennsylvania.
1999-06-30 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1999-06-30 Acquired Trenton Savings Bank Fsb in Lawrenceville, New Jersey.
2002-03-08 Acquired Main Street Bank in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-05-03 Acquired Sovereign Trust Company in Manchester Township, New Jersey.
2004-02-06 Acquired First Essex Bank in Lawrence, Massachusetts.
2004-07-23 Acquired Nantucket Bank in Nantucket, Massachusetts.
2004-07-23 Acquired Compass Bank For Savings in New Bedford, Massachusetts.
2005-02-11 Acquired Waypoint Bank in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania.
2006-09-09 Acquired Independence Community Bank in Brooklyn, New York.
2011-06-20 Moved bank headquarters from Wyomissing, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $521,998,000
Total deposits: $314,866,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Home Savings Bank, F.S.B., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10702