Pennsylvania – Northampton – Walnutport
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Pennsylvania
Northampton
Walnutport
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
440
1923
FDIC Certificate Number: 440
FDIC's unique number: 337
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia
Federal Reserve ID Number: 18313
Report Date: 1998-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-03-03
1923-11-23 Institution established. Original name: Walnutport State Bank.
1983-02-01 Changed name to First Lehigh Bank .
1999-01-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Patriot Bank in Pottstown, Pennsylvania.
2001-02-21 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
2003-03-04 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2003-03-04 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2004-06-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Susquehanna Patriot Bank in Marlton, New Jersey.
2006-04-22 Acquired Minotola National Bank in Vineland, New Jersey.
2007-08-15 Changed name to Susquehanna Bank Dv .
2007-08-15 Moved bank headquarters from Marlton, New Jersey to Bryn Mawr, Pennsylvania.
2008-10-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Susquehanna Bank in Lititz, Pennsylvania.
2011-10-01 Acquired Abington Savings Bank in Jenkintown, Pennsylvania.
Total assets: $104,169,000
Total deposits: $95,068,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Lehigh Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Lehigh Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Lehigh Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18475