South Dakota – Turner – Centerville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.firstmidwestbank.com
South Dakota
Turner
Centerville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
6078
1883
FDIC Certificate Number: 6078
FDIC's unique number: 4102
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 95051
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-03-16
1883-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Bank Of Centerville.
1988-06-15 Changed name to First Midwest Bank .
Total assets: $100,598,000
Total deposits: $88,920,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $88,920,000
Equity capital: $11,202,000
Net income: $3,776,000
Return on Assets: 6.93
Return on Equity: 86.37
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
First Midwest Bank - Deerfield Branch
First Midwest Bank - Deerfield Branch
First Midwest Bank - First Midwest Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
First Midwest Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Midwest Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Midwest Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9288