Missouri – Texas – Houston
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Missouri
Texas
Houston
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
13765
1911
FDIC Certificate Number: 13765
FDIC's unique number: 8607
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 523956
Report Date: 2001-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23529
The date of the last data update: 2001-06-27
1911-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Raymondville.
1982-08-20 Changed name to Farmers State Bank Of Texas County .
1985-12-16 Moved bank headquarters from Raymondville, Missouri to Houston, Missouri.
1986-12-30 Reorganized.
1986-12-30 Changed name to Texas County Bank .
1998-01-02 Changed name to First National Bank .
1998-01-02 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1998-06-08 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2001-06-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank in Mountain View, Missouri.
2009-04-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Landmark Bank, National Association in Columbia, Missouri.
Total assets: $54,651,000
Total deposits: $50,430,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4700