Kansas – Phillips – Phillipsburg
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.agbank.com
Kansas
Phillips
Phillipsburg
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
4756
1884
FDIC Certificate Number: 4756
FDIC's unique number: 3172
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hays
Federal Reserve ID Number: 183958
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 3601
Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1884-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Phillipsburg.
1990-07-28 Acquired Commercial State Bank in Long Island, Kansas.
1993-01-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of Logan in Logan, Kansas.
1993-03-01 Changed name to First National Bank And Trust .
Total assets: $162,854,000
Total deposits: $132,142,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $132,142,000
Equity capital: $25,922,000
Net income: $1,293,000
Return on Assets: 1.6
Return on Equity: 10.44
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Golden Plains Bankshares, Inc.
First National Bank And Trust - Convenience Bank Branch
First National Bank And Trust - First National Bank And Trust
First National Bank And Trust - Long Island Branch
First National Bank And Trust - Smith County Bank Branch
First National Bank And Trust - West Main Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First National Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First National Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3559