Oklahoma – Kay – Blackwell
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Oklahoma
Kay
Blackwell
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
14804
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 14804
FDIC's unique number: 9261
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tulsa
Federal Reserve ID Number: 140858
Report Date: 1991-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14278
The date of the last data update: 1991-09-11
1934-09-17 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank In Blackwell.
1972-02-15 Changed name to First National Bank And Trust Company, Blackwell, Oklahoma .
1991-08-29 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Central National Bank & Trust Co., of Enid in Enid, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $33,498,000
Total deposits: $33,799,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First National Bank and Trust Company, Blackwell, Oklahoma does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First National Bank and Trust Company, Blackwell, Oklahoma, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank and Trust Company, Blackwell, Oklahoma will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-941