Colorado – Kiowa – Eads
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Colorado
Kiowa
Eads
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
14563
1887
FDIC Certificate Number: 14563
FDIC's unique number: 9100
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 73255
Report Date: 1984-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14213
The date of the last data update: 1995-10-02
1887-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank In Eads.
1985-02-14 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of OMNIBANK of Kiowa County, National Association in Eads, Colorado.
1987-02-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Valley State Bank in Lamar, Colorado.
2006-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Girard National Bank in Girard, Kansas.
Total assets: $17,547,000
Total deposits: $16,718,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First National Bank in Eads does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First National Bank in Eads, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank in Eads will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16075