Louisiana – De Soto – Mansfield
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Louisiana
De Soto
Mansfield
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
4305
1920
FDIC Certificate Number: 4305
FDIC's unique number: 2822
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport
Federal Reserve ID Number: 938158
Report Date: 1997-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 11669
The date of the last data update: 1998-01-15
1920-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank In Mansfield.
1970-04-11 Acquired Bank Of Grand Cane in Grand Cane, Louisiana.
1998-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hibernia National Bank in New Orleans, Louisiana.
1998-02-01 Acquired Argentbank in Thibodaux, Louisiana.
1998-07-01 Acquired Peoples Bank & Trust Company in Minden, Louisiana.
1999-01-01 Acquired Hibernia National Bank Of Texas in Texarkana, Texas.
1999-03-08 Acquired First Service Bank in Marshall, Texas.
1999-05-21 Acquired Beaumont Trust Company, National Association in Beaumont, Texas.
2004-05-13 Acquired Coastal Banc, S.S.B. in Houston, Texas.
2006-04-24 Changed name to Capital One, National Association .
2007-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from New Orleans, Louisiana to Mclean, Virginia.
2007-07-01 Acquired Capital One, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-08-01 Acquired North Fork Bank in Mattituck, New York.
2008-03-08 Acquired Superior Savings Of New England, National Association in Branford, Connecticut.
2009-07-30 Acquired Chevy Chase Bank, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2011-04-01 Reorganized.
Total assets: $101,152,000
Total deposits: $87,960,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First National Bank in Mansfield does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First National Bank in Mansfield, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank in Mansfield will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13098