Colorado – Routt – Steamboat Springs
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Colorado
Routt
Steamboat Springs
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
25741
1984
FDIC Certificate Number: 25741
FDIC's unique number: 17614
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 471459
Report Date: 1998-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 18436
The date of the last data update: 1998-06-16
1984-11-01 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Steamboat Springs.
1994-01-24 Changed name to First National Bank Of Colorado .
1998-05-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Vectra Bank Colorado, National Association in Denver, Colorado.
1998-08-28 Acquired Independent Bank in Kersey, Colorado.
1998-08-31 Acquired Eagle Bank in Broomfield, Colorado.
1998-09-11 Acquired Pitkin County Bank And Trust Company in Aspen, Colorado.
1998-10-30 Acquired Mountain National Bank in Woodland Park, Colorado.
1998-11-30 Acquired Citizens Bank in Westminster, Colorado.
1998-12-31 Moved bank headquarters from Denver, Colorado to Farmington, New Mexico.
1998-12-31 Acquired Centennial Bank, National Association in Farmington, New Mexico.
2001-11-09 Acquired The Minnequa Bank Of Pueblo in Pueblo, Colorado.
Total assets: $101,929,000
Total deposits: $89,397,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First National Bank of Colorado does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First National Bank of Colorado, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank of Colorado will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25057