Colorado – Montrose – Montrose
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Colorado
Montrose
Montrose
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
3043
1904
FDIC Certificate Number: 3043
FDIC's unique number: 1938
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 584050
Report Date: 1993-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 7288
The date of the last data update: 1994-04-05
1904-01-01 Institution established. Original name: United Bank Of Montrose National Association.
1987-05-01 Changed name to First National Bank Of Montrose .
1994-03-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Western Colorado, National Association in Salida, Colorado.
1995-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Colorado, National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2002-08-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired Bank One, Illinois, National Association in Springfield, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired American National Bank And Trust Company Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Oklahoma, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Kentucky, National Association in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $92,381,000
Total deposits: $73,689,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First National Bank of Montrose does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First National Bank of Montrose, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank of Montrose will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1049