Oklahoma – Oklahoma – Oklahoma City
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.fnbok.com
Oklahoma
Oklahoma
Oklahoma City
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
4211
1917
FDIC Certificate Number: 4211
FDIC's unique number: 2763
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tulsa
Federal Reserve ID Number: 525053
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 11397
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-08
1917-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank In Tonkawa.
1985-04-04 Acquired Bank Of Hunter in Hunter, Oklahoma.
1987-04-16 Changed name to First National Bank Of Oklahoma .
1993-10-14 Acquired Leadership Bank, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1997-12-01 Moved bank headquarters from Tonkawa, Oklahoma to Ponca City, Oklahoma.
2011-04-30 Moved bank headquarters from Ponca City, Oklahoma to Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $249,409,000
Total deposits: $215,699,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $215,699,000
Equity capital: $20,250,000
Net income: $1,919,000
Return on Assets: 1.55
Return on Equity: 19.01
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: First Bancorp Of Oklahoma, Inc.
First National Bank Of Oklahoma - First National Bank Of Oklahom
First National Bank Of Oklahoma - Oklahoma City Branch
First National Bank Of Oklahoma - Ponca City Branch
First National Bank Of Oklahoma - Tonkawa Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First National Bank of Oklahoma does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First National Bank of Oklahoma, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank of Oklahoma will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22032