Texas
Young
Olney
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
26920
1987
FDIC Certificate Number: 26920
FDIC's unique number: 36308
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 717867
Report Date: 2010-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21478
The date of the last data update: 2011-01-04
1987-03-12 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Olney.
1987-03-12 Acquired The First National Bank Of Olney in Olney, Texas.
1993-02-13 Acquired New First City, Texas - Graham, National Association in Graham, Texas.
2010-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of InterBank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2011-06-14 Acquired First National Bank Of Borger in Panhandle, Texas.
Total assets: $52,815,000
Total deposits: $46,985,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First National Bank of Olney does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First National Bank of Olney, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank of Olney will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4797