Georgia – Troup – West Point
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Georgia
Troup
West Point
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
192
1906
FDIC Certificate Number: 192
FDIC's unique number: 154
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 30632
Report Date: 2000-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14547
The date of the last data update: 2001-03-28
1906-01-13 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of West Point.
1997-11-01 Acquired First State Bank Of Uniontown in Uniontown, Alabama.
2001-03-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Capital City Bank in Tallahassee, Florida.
2001-11-03 Acquired First National Bank Of Grady County in Cairo, Georgia.
2004-03-20 Acquired The Quincy State Bank in Quincy, Florida.
2004-10-16 Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank in Dublin, Georgia.
2005-05-21 Acquired The First National Bank Of Alachua in Alachua, Florida.
Total assets: $152,610,000
Total deposits: $111,790,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First National Bank of West Point does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First National Bank of West Point, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank of West Point will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-833