Kansas – Leavenworth – Leavenworth
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Kansas
Leavenworth
Leavenworth
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
4712
1856
FDIC Certificate Number: 4712
FDIC's unique number: 3134
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 22459
Report Date: 2011-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 182
The date of the last data update: 2011-06-13
1856-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Leavenworth.
1979-03-19 Changed name to First National Bank & Trust Co. Of Leavenworth .
1995-07-21 Acquired Fort National Bank in Easton, Kansas.
2011-06-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Exchange National Bank & Trust Co. in Atchison, Kansas.
Total assets: $101,339,000
Total deposits: $85,725,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First National Bank & Trust Co. of Leavenworth does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First National Bank & Trust Co. of Leavenworth, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank & Trust Co. of Leavenworth will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17025