www.firstnnb.com
Iowa
Jasper
Newton
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
4482
1932
FDIC Certificate Number: 4482
FDIC's unique number: 2962
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Des Moines
Federal Reserve ID Number: 242949
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 13609
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1932-03-28 Institution established. Original name: The Newton National Bank.
1977-05-17 Changed name to First Newton National Bank .
Total assets: $75,256,000
Total deposits: $67,445,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $67,445,000
Equity capital: $7,104,000
Net income: $254,000
Return on Assets: 0.68
Return on Equity: 7.43
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: United Iowa Bancshares, Inc.
First Newton National Bank - Colonial Plaza Branch
First Newton National Bank - First Newton National Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
First Newton National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Newton National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Newton National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23807