New Hampshire – Hillsborough – Manchester
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
New Hampshire
Hillsborough
Manchester
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6238
1853
FDIC Certificate Number: 6238
FDIC's unique number: 4209
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 328106
Report Date: 1992-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 1520
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-24
1853-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Merchants National Bank Of Manchester.
1989-04-28 Acquired The Bedford Bank in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1989-04-28 Changed name to First Nh Bank, National Association .
1990-02-28 Acquired First Cheshire Bank in Keene, New Hampshire.
1992-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $822,464,000
Total deposits: $612,981,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First NH Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First NH Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First NH Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21084