New Hampshire – Grafton – Lebanon
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Grafton
Lebanon
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
6234
1829
FDIC Certificate Number: 6234
FDIC's unique number: 4205
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 269601
Report Date: 1990-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-02-11
1829-10-05 Institution established. Original name: The National Bank Of Lebanon.
1985-05-31 Reorganized.
1985-05-31 Changed name to First Nh Bank Of Lebanon .
1991-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1991-03-29 Acquired City Bank And Trust in Claremont, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Nashua Trust Company in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Amoskeag Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bank Meridian, National Association in Hampton, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $135,317,000
Total deposits: $125,685,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First NH Bank of Lebanon does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First NH Bank of Lebanon, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First NH Bank of Lebanon will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21086